+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (35)
On June 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On May 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
On May 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Amendments S-5291 and S-5296 filed.
On May 2, 2018 in the House:
- Asked and received unanimous consent for immediate consideration.
- Amendment H-8465 filed.
- Amendment H-8465 adopted.
- Amendment H-8450 filed.
- Amendment H-8450 out of order.
- Amendment H-8463 filed.
- Amendment H-8463 lost.
- Amendment H-8448 withdrawn.
- Amendment H-8449 lost.
- Withdrawn.
- SF 2414 substituted.
On May 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Amendment S-5298 to S-5296 filed, lost.
On May 2, 2018 in the House:
- Read first time, passed on file.
On May 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Message from House.
- Amendment S-5297 to S-5296 filed, lost.
On May 2, 2018 in the House:
- Passed House, ayes 57, nays 36.
- Substituted for HF 2497.
- Immediate message.
- Message from Senate.
On May 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
- Passed Senate, ayes 45, nays 3.
- Amendment S-5296 adopted.
- Amendment S-5291 out of order.
On May 1, 2018 in the House:
- Amendments H-8448, H-8449 and H-8450 filed.
On April 30, 2018 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending amendment and passage.
- Committee report, recommending amendment and passage.
- NOBA: House Full Approps
- Introduced, placed on Appropriations calendar.
On April 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill.
- Introduced, placed on Appropriations calendar.
On April 25, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Schneider, Bolkcom, Boulton, Breitbach, Chelgren, Costello, Danielson, Dotzler, Garrett, Greene, Guth, Hart, Johnson, C., Kraayenbrink, Lofgren, Mathis, McCoy, Ragan, Rozenboom, Shipley and Zumbach.
+ − Sponsor
COMMITTEE ON APPROPRIATIONS
Type:
Primary Sponsor