+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On June 17, 2022 in the House:
- Vetoed by Governor.
On June 1, 2022 in the House:
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor.
On March 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn.
- HF 2493 substituted.
- Amendment S-5042 filed, adopted.
On March 8, 2022 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
On March 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
- Passed Senate, yeas 47, nays 0.
- Substituted for SF 2291.
On March 2, 2022 in the House:
- Immediate message.
- Amendment H-8068 adopted.
- Passed House, yeas 99, nays 0.
On March 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Message from House.
- Read first time, attached to similar SF 2291.
- Attached to similar HF 2493.
On March 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee report, recommending passage.
On February 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/23/2022 10:00AM Senate Lounge.
On February 22, 2022 in the House:
- Amendment H-8068 filed.
On February 21, 2022 in the House:
- Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2493.
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On February 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Cournoyer, Johnson, and J. Smith.
On February 17, 2022 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending passage.
On February 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Education.
On February 16, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0
On February 15, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/16/2022 8:00AM House Lounge 2.
- Subcommittee: Hite, Bossman and Cahill.
- Introduced, referred to Education.
+ − Sponsor
ADMINISTRATIVE RULES REVIEW COMMITTEE
Type:
Primary Sponsor