+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (31)
On April 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
On March 22, 2022 in the House:
- Explanation of vote.
On March 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Message from House.
On March 15, 2022 in the House:
- Immediate message.
- Passed House, yeas 96, nays 0.
- Substituted for HF 2492.
- Withdrawn.
- SF 2295 substituted.
- Amendment H-8055 adopted.
On February 22, 2022 in the House:
- Committee amendment H-8055 filed
On February 21, 2022 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
- Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2492.
On February 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Amendment S-5009 adopted.
- Passed Senate, yeas 49, nays 0.
On February 21, 2022 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
- Read first time, passed on file.
On February 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
On February 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Amendment S-5009 filed.
On February 16, 2022 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending amendment and passage.
- Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0
On February 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
- Committee report, approving bill.
On February 15, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/16/2022 8:15AM RM 304.
- Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2295.
On February 14, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Osmundson, Gustafson and Hansen.
- Introduced, referred to Judiciary.
On February 9, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
On February 8, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/09/2022 2:00PM Room G15.
- Subcommittee: Zaun, Bolkcom, and Dawson.
- Introduced, referred to Judiciary.
+ − Sponsor
COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY
Type:
Primary Sponsor