+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (39)
On June 25, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On June 24, 2020 in the House:
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor.
On June 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Explanation of vote.
On June 14, 2020 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
On June 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
- Explanation of vote.
- Passed Senate, yeas 31, nays 16.
- Senate concurred with S-5146.
On June 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Message from House, with amendment S-5146.
On June 11, 2020 in the House:
- Immediate message.
- Passed House, yeas 95, nays 2.
- House concurred in Senate amendment H-8256, as amended.
- Amendment H-8260 to Senate amendment H-8256 adopted.
On June 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, yeas 30, nays 19.
- Amendment S-5124 to S-5117 filed, lost.
- Amendment S-5117 adopted, as amended.
- Amendment S-5123 to S-5117 filed, adopted.
- Immediate message.
On June 10, 2020 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
- Senate amendment H-8256 filed.
- Amendment H-8260 filed.
On June 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Amendment S-5117 filed.
- Committee report, recommending amendment and passage.
On March 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: R. Smith, Chapman, and Giddens.
On March 10, 2020 in the House:
- Explanation of vote.
On March 9, 2020 in the House:
- Explanation of vote.
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- Passed House, yeas 97, nays none.
- Immediate message.
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read first time, referred to State Government.
- Message from House.
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- Withdrawn.
- Withdrawn.
On February 20, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On February 19, 2020 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending passage.
- Committee report, recommending passage.
On February 13, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
On February 10, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/12/2020 8:00AM House Lounge.
On February 6, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Hite, Hanusa and Konfrst.
On January 15, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to Local Government.
+ − Sponsor
COMMITTEE ON LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Type:
Primary Sponsor