+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (30)
On June 25, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On June 24, 2020 in the House:
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor.
On June 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Message from House.
On June 13, 2020 in the House:
- Immediate message.
- Explanation of vote.
- Passed House, yeas 94, nays 1.
- House concurred H-8316.
- Senate amendment H-8316 filed.
- Message from Senate.
On June 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
- Explanation of vote.
- Passed Senate, yeas 47, nays 0.
- Amendment S-5100 adopted.
On June 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Amendment S-5100 filed.
- Committee report, recommending amendment and passage.
On March 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Sweeney, Carlin, and Quirmbach.
On March 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read first time, referred to Human Resources.
- Message from House.
On March 9, 2020 in the House:
- Withdrawn.
- Withdrawn.
- Immediate message.
- Passed House, yeas 98, nays 1.
On February 20, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On February 19, 2020 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending passage.
- Committee report, recommending passage.
On February 17, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
On February 13, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: Upon Adjournment House Lounge.
- Subcommittee: Best, Bergan and Ehlert.
- Introduced, referred to Human Resources.
+ − Sponsor
COMMITTEE ON HUMAN RESOURCES
Type:
Primary Sponsor