+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 16, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On May 4, 2016 in the House:
- Sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President.
On April 27, 2016 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
On April 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
- Passed Senate, ayes 49, nays none.
- Committee report, recommending passage.
On April 27, 2016 in the House:
- Fiscal note. Senate Clip Sheet.
On April 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Message from House.
- Read first time, referred to Ways & Means.
- Subcommittee, Hogg, Bolkcom, and Feenstra.
On April 25, 2016 in the House:
- Immediate message.
- Explanation of vote.
- Passed House, ayes 94, nays none.
- Amendment H-8281 filed, adopted.
On April 21, 2016 in the House:
- Fiscal note. House Clip Sheet.
- Committee report, recommending passage.
On April 20, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Ways & Means.
On April 19, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on Appropriations calendar.
+ − Sponsor
COMMITTEE COMMITTEE
Type:
Primary Sponsor