+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (21)
On April 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Message from House.
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- Immediate message.
- Passed House, ayes 98 nays none.
- Substituted for HF 2460.
- Withdrawn.
- SF 2310 substituted.
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Read first time, passed on file.
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, ayes 50, nays 0.
- Immediate message.
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On February 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill.
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/08/2018 8:00AM House Lounge
- Subcommittee: Sexton, Zumbach and Lensing.
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/12/2018 11:00AM Senate Lobbyist Lounge
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Carlin, Brown, and Jochum.
+ − Sponsor
COMMITTEE ON STATE GOVERNMENT
Type:
Primary Sponsor