+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 23, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Governor. H.J. 897.
On May 2, 2014 in the House:
- Sent to Governor. H.J. 895.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 895.
On April 28, 2014 in the House:
- Message from Senate. H.J. 824.
On April 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Immediate message. S.J. 873.
- Passed Senate, ayes 47, nays 1. S.J. 871.
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 825.
On April 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee reassigned, Seng, Behn, and Black. S.J. 819.
On April 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee, Quirmbach, Behn, and Bolkcom. S.J. 733.
On April 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Fiscal note. SCS.
On April 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read first time, referred to Ways & Means. S.J. 697.
- Message from House. S.J. 697.
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Immediate message. H.J. 628.
- Passed House, ayes 95, nays 4. H.J. 624.
- Amendment H-8189 as amended, adopted. H.J. 624.
- Amendment H-8201 to amendment H-8189 filed, adopted. H.J. 624.
On March 31, 2014 in the House:
- Amendment H-8189 filed. H.J. 611.
On March 25, 2014 in the House:
- Fiscal note. HCS.
On March 24, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. H.J. 562.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor