+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On March 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Dawson, Kinney, and J. Taylor.
On February 24, 2022 in the House:
- Withdrawn.
On February 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read first time, referred to Judiciary.
- Message from House.
On February 24, 2022 in the House:
- Immediate message.
- Passed House, yeas 96, nays 0.
On February 17, 2022 in the House:
- Fiscal note.
On February 16, 2022 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On February 15, 2022 in the House:
- Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2446.
- Committee report, recommending passage.
On February 9, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-0
On February 8, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/09/2022 7:30AM RM 304.
- Subcommittee: Westrich, Kerr and Wessel-Kroeschell.
On February 2, 2022 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to Public Safety.
+ − Sponsor
COMMITTEE ON PUBLIC SAFETY
Type:
Primary Sponsor