+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (45)
On May 17, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On May 11, 2018 in the House:
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor.
On April 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Message from House.
On April 17, 2018 in the House:
- Immediate message.
- Passed House, ayes 98, nays none.
- House concurred H-8298.
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Amendment S-5165 adopted.
- Passed Senate, ayes 49, nays 0.
- Immediate message.
On March 20, 2018 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
- Senate amendment H-8298 filed.
On March 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Amendment S-5165 filed.
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee report, recommending passage.
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Fiscal note.
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Feenstra, Behn, and Hogg.
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- Explanation of vote.
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Immediate message.
- Amendment H-8152 to H-8142 filed, adopted.
- Passed House, ayes 96 nays none.
- Amendment H-8142 adopted, as amended.
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Message from House.
- Read first time, referred to Ways and Means.
- Subcommittee: Brown, Hogg, and Schultz.
- Subcommittee: Brown, Hogg, and Schultz.
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways and Means.
- Referred to Ways and Means.
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Amendment H-8142 filed.
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On February 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill.
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
- Committee report, approving bill.
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
- Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/13/2018 10:30AM RM 319.4 (Crow's Nest)
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/13/2018 10:30AM RM 319.4 (Crow's Nest)
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/08/2018 9:30AM RM 319.4 (Crow's Nest) (Cancelled)
- Subcommittee: Guth, Sinclair, and Allen.
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/08/2018 9:30AM RM 319.4 (Crow's Nest) (Cancelled)
- Subcommittee: Guth, Sinclair, and Allen.
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/01/2018 12:30PM House Lounge
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/01/2018 12:30PM House Lounge
On January 30, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Pettengill, Landon and Jacoby.
+ − Sponsor
COMMITTEE ON COMMERCE
Type:
Primary Sponsor