+ − Transition
HF244 is now HF604
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (33)
On June 22, 2022 in the House:
- Fiscal note.
On May 24, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor.
On April 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Message from House.
On April 6, 2022 in the House:
- Immediate message.
- Passed House, yeas 97, nays 0.
- House concurred in Senate amendment H-8322.
On April 5, 2022 in the House:
- Senate amendment H-8322 filed.
- Message from Senate.
On April 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
- Passed Senate, yeas 48, nays 0.
- Amendment S-5114 filed, adopted.
On March 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar under unfinished business.
On March 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee report, recommending passage.
On March 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee reassigned: Rozenboom, Sweeney, and Trone Garriott.
- Subcommittee Meeting: 03/14/2022 3:00PM Room G17.
On March 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 03/15/2021 11:00AM 217 Conference Room.
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Explanation of vote.
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Rozenboom, Sweeney, and Trone Garriott.
On March 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read first time, referred to Education.
- Message from House.
On March 8, 2021 in the House:
- Immediate message.
- Passed House, yeas 96, nays none.
- Withdrawn.
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- Fiscal note.
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
- Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 604.
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending passage.
On February 16, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/16/2021 12:30PM RM 102, Sup. Ct. Consult.
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Salmon, Donahue and Kerr.
On January 27, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to Education.