+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On April 21, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 20, 2016 in the House:
- Sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President.
On April 6, 2016 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
On April 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
- Passed Senate, ayes 48, nays 2.
On March 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee report, recommending passage.
On March 24, 2016 in the House:
- Explanation of vote.
On March 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Message from House.
- Read first time, referred to Transportation.
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- Immediate message.
- Explanation of vote.
- Passed House, ayes 92, nays 3.
- Amendment H-8133 as amended, adopted.
- Amendment H-8140 to amendment H-8133 filed, adopted.
On March 22, 2016 in the House:
- Amendment H-8133 filed.
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar.
+ − Sponsor
COMMITTEE COMMITTEE
Type:
Primary Sponsor