+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On February 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Goodwin, Dawson, and Dotzler.
- Fiscal note.
On February 16, 2022 in the House:
- Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2433.
- Introduced, referred to Ways and Means.
On February 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways and Means.
On February 15, 2022 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending amendment and passage.
On February 10, 2022 in the House:
- Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2261.
On February 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
- Committee report, approving bill.
On February 9, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. Vote Total: 3-0
On February 3, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/09/2022 8:30AM House Lounge.
On February 1, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee: McClintock, Boden and Gjerde.
- Introduced, referred to Veterans Affairs.
On January 19, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
On January 18, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 01/19/2022 11:30AM Room G17.
On January 15, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Green, Giddens, and Lofgren.
On January 14, 2022 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to Veterans Affairs.
+ − Sponsor
COMMITTEE ON VETERANS AFFAIRS
Type:
Primary Sponsor