+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 28, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On March 27, 2018 in the House:
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President.
On March 19, 2018 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
On March 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
- Passed Senate, ayes 47, nays 0.
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee report, recommending passage.
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Kapucian, Brown, and Hart.
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read first time, referred to Agriculture.
- Message from House.
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- Point of order raised on H-8094, ruled not germane.
- Immediate message.
- Point of order raised on H-8095, ruled not germane.
- Passed House, ayes 96 nays 2.
On February 23, 2018 in the House:
- Amendments H-8094 and H-8095 filed.
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/12/2018 3:15PM House Lounge
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Zumbach, Kerr and Cohoon.
+ − Sponsor
COMMITTEE ON AGRICULTURE
Type:
Primary Sponsor