+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Withdrawn.
- Withdrawn.
- SF 2139 substituted.
- Amendment H-8181 adopted.
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Amendment H-8181 filed.
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Gustafson, Bennett and McKean.
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Judiciary.
On January 30, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Passed subcommittee.
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
On January 18, 2017 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Gustafson, Oldson and Paustian.
- Subcommittee Meeting: 01/19/2017 10:30AM House Lounge
+ − Sponsor
COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY
Type:
Primary Sponsor