+ − Transition
HF2397 is now HF2582
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (19)
On May 23, 2022 in the House:
- Explanation of vote.
On April 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
On April 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 04/26/2022 8:30AM Room 217 Conference Room.
On April 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Goodwin, Jochum, and R. Smith.
On April 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- Fiscal note.
- Read first time, referred to Ways and Means.
- Message from House.
On April 5, 2022 in the House:
- Withdrawn.
- Amendment H-8320 filed, adopted.
- Passed House, yeas 64, nays 33.
- Immediate message.
On April 1, 2022 in the House:
- Fiscal note.
On March 30, 2022 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar.
- Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2582.
- Committee report, recommending amendment and passage.
On March 1, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0
On February 28, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 03/01/2022 8:15AM RM 102, Sup. Ct. Consult.
On February 23, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Nordman, Kaufmann and Kurth.
On February 16, 2022 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to Ways and Means.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor