+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 26, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Governor. H.J. 602.
On March 24, 2014 in the House:
- Sent to Governor. H.J. 565.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 565.
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Message from Senate. H.J. 505.
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Immediate message. S.J. 572.
- Passed Senate, ayes 47, nays none. S.J. 570.
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 543.
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee, Mathis, Beall, and Johnson. S.J. 523.
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- Explanation of vote. H.J. 468.
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read first time, referred to Education. S.J. 491.
- Message from House. S.J. 491.
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Immediate message. H.J. 436.
- Passed House, ayes 99, nays none. H.J. 432.
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 307.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor