+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 30, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On March 28, 2016 in the House:
- Sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President.
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
- Passed Senate, ayes 49, nays none.
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee report, recommending passage.
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee, Bolkcom, Costello, and Mathis.
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read first time, referred to Human Resources.
- Message from House.
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- Immediate message.
- Passed House, ayes 97, nays 1.
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
+ − Sponsor
COMMITTEE COMMITTEE
Type:
Primary Sponsor