+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On June 4, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Local Government.
On May 13, 2015 in the House:
- Amendment H-1353 filed.
On May 12, 2015 in the House:
- Amendment H-1347 filed.
On April 27, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On April 7, 2015 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 1:30PM House Lounge
- Government Oversight: Pettengill Chair, Gaines, Heartsill
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Recorded