+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (30)
On June 22, 2022 in the House:
- Fiscal note.
On March 23, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor.
On February 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn.
- HF 2373 substituted.
On February 28, 2022 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
On February 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
- Passed Senate, yeas 40, nays 5.
- Substituted for SF 2265.
On February 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Attached to companion HF 2373.
- Read first time, attached to companion SF 2265.
- Message from House.
On February 23, 2022 in the House:
- Immediate message.
- Passed House, yeas 61, nays 35.
On February 16, 2022 in the House:
- Fiscal note.
On February 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Fiscal note.
On February 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill.
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On February 10, 2022 in the House:
- Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2265.
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On February 9, 2022 in the House:
- Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2373.
- Committee report, recommending passage.
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/10/2022 10:00AM Senate Lounge.
On February 8, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-1
On February 4, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/08/2022 12:30PM RM 103, Sup. Ct. Chamber.
On February 1, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Nordman, Boden and Wolfe.
- Introduced, referred to State Government.
- Subcommittee: Guth, Boulton, and Smith, R.
- Introduced, referred to State Government.
+ − Sponsor
COMMITTEE ON STATE GOVERNMENT
Type:
Primary Sponsor