+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 26, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Governor. H.J. 602.
On March 24, 2014 in the House:
- Sent to Governor. H.J. 565.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 565.
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Message from Senate. H.J. 508.
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Immediate message. S.J. 603.
- Passed Senate, ayes 45, nays none. S.J. 602.
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 559.
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee, Danielson, Bowman, and Chapman. S.J. 535.
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read first time, referred to State Government. S.J. 458.
- Message from House. S.J. 458.
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Immediate message. H.J. 411.
- Explanations of votes. H.J. 416.
- Passed House, ayes 98, nays none. H.J. 408.
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 304.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor