+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (29)
On March 28, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On March 27, 2018 in the House:
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President.
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
On March 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
- Passed Senate, ayes 47, nays 2.
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee report, recommending passage.
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Garrett, Chapman, and Ragan.
On February 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read first time, referred to Human Resources.
- Message from House.
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- Motion to suspend rules for consideration of H-8073.
- Amendment H-8084 to H-8071 filed, adopted.
- Amendment H-8071 lost, as amended.
- Point of order raised on H-8072, ruled not germane.
- Motion to suspend rules for consideration of H-8072.
- Motion to suspend rules failed.
- Point of order raised on H-8073, ruled not germane.
- Motion to suspend rules for consideration of H-8075.
- Motion to suspend rules failed.
- Point of order raised on H-8075, ruled not germane.
- Motion to suspend rules failed.
- Point of order raised, Rule 10, decorum in debate, ruled point well taken.
- Passed House, ayes 94, nays 1.
- Immediate message.
- Withdrawn.
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Amendments H-8071, H-8072, H-8073 and H-8075 filed.
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Heaton, Anderson and R. Taylor.
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to Human Resources.
+ − Sponsor
COMMITTEE ON HUMAN RESOURCES
Type:
Primary Sponsor