+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 26, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Governor. H.J. 602.
On March 24, 2014 in the House:
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 565.
- Sent to Governor. H.J. 565.
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Message from Senate. H.J. 507.
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Immediate message. S.J. 598.
- Passed Senate, ayes 45, nays none. S.J. 594.
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 536.
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Explanations of votes. H.J. 416.
- Amendment H-8034 adopted. H.J. 410.
- Passed House, ayes 98, nays none. H.J. 411.
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read first time, referred to Commerce. S.J. 457.
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Secretary's report on correction in amendment H-8034. H.J. 415.
- Immediate message. H.J. 411.
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Message from House. S.J. 457.
- Subcommittee, McCoy, Anderson, et al. S.J. 466.
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Amendment H-8034 filed. H.J. 339.
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 280.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor