+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 29, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On March 27, 2018 in the House:
- Sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President.
On March 20, 2018 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
- Passed Senate, ayes 49, nays 0.
- Amendment S-5169B withdrawn.
- Amendment S-5169A lost.
- Amendment S-5169 filed.
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee report, recommending passage.
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Guth, Boulton, and Zumbach.
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read first time, referred to Commerce.
- Message from House.
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- Immediate message.
- Passed House, ayes 98 nays none.
- Amendment H-8060 adopted, as amended.
- Amendment H-8103 to H-8060 filed, adopted.
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Deferred, retained on calendar.
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Amendment H-8060 filed.
On February 9, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
On January 24, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 01/25/2018 8:30AM House Lounge
On January 23, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Vander Linden, Mohr, G. and Forbes.
+ − Sponsor
COMMITTEE ON COMMERCE
Type:
Primary Sponsor