+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 26, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Governor. H.J. 602.
On March 24, 2014 in the House:
- Sent to Governor. H.J. 565.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 565.
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Message from Senate. H.J. 507.
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Immediate message. S.J. 607.
- Passed Senate, ayes 43, nays 2. S.J. 606.
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 558.
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read first time, referred to State Government. S.J. 508.
- Message from House. S.J. 508.
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- Explanation of vote. H.J. 468.
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Immediate message. H.J. 454.
- Passed House, ayes 99, nays none. H.J. 451.
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 258.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor