+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Governor. H.J. 718.
On April 7, 2014 in the House:
- Sent to Governor. H.J. 680.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 680.
On March 27, 2014 in the House:
- Message from Senate. H.J. 606.
On March 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Immediate message. S.J. 660.
- Passed Senate, ayes 46, nays none. S.J. 659.
On March 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 619.
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 496.
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read first time, referred to State Government. S.J. 397.
- Message from House. S.J. 397.
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Explanation of vote. H.J. 351.
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Immediate message. H.J. 331.
- Passed House, ayes 98, nays none. H.J. 326.
- Fiscal note. HCS.
On February 17, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 249.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor