+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On June 29, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On June 24, 2020 in the House:
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor.
On June 10, 2020 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
On June 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
- Passed Senate, yeas 49, nays 0.
- Amendment S-5115 withdrawn.
On June 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Amendment S-5115 filed.
- Committee report, recommending amendment and passage.
On March 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Cournoyer, R. Smith, and T. Taylor.
On March 10, 2020 in the House:
- Explanation of vote.
- Explanation of vote.
On March 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Message from House.
- Read first time, referred to State Government.
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- Immediate message.
- Passed House, yeas 96, nays none.
- Amendment H-8046 withdrawn.
On February 28, 2020 in the House:
- Fiscal note.
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- Amendment H-8046 filed.
On February 20, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on calendar
- Committee report, recommending passage.
On February 13, 2020 in the House:
- Sponsor added, Isenhart.
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
On February 12, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/13/2020 7:45AM House Lounge.
On February 11, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Mohr, G., Breckenridge and Thorup.
On February 6, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to Public Safety.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor