+ − Transition
HF2239 is now SF2253
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (40)
On June 22, 2022 in the House:
- Fiscal note.
On May 24, 2022 in the House:
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor.
- Signed by Governor.
On April 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Message from House.
On April 4, 2022 in the House:
- Immediate message.
- Passed House, yeas 97, nays 0.
- House concurred in Senate amendment H-8290.
On March 30, 2022 in the House:
- Fiscal note.
On March 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, yeas 47, nays 0.
- Substituted for SF 2253.
- Amendment S-5094 filed, adopted.
- HF 2239 substituted.
- Immediate message.
On March 29, 2022 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
- Senate amendment H-8290 filed.
On March 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn.
On March 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar under unfinished business.
- Placed on calendar under unfinished business.
On February 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Message from House.
- Read first time, attached to companion SF 2253.
- Attached to companion HF 2239.
On February 22, 2022 in the House:
- Immediate message.
- Passed House, yeas 92, nays 3.
On February 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Fiscal note.
On February 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill.
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On February 8, 2022 in the House:
- Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2253.
On February 7, 2022 in the House:
- Fiscal note.
On February 2, 2022 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On January 31, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
- Committee report, recommending amendment and passage.
On January 28, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 01/31/2022 3:00PM Senate Lounge.
On January 26, 2022 in the House:
- Tabled until future meeting.
On January 25, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 01/26/2022 10:30AM Room G17.
On January 13, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0
On January 12, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Shipley, Garrett, and Kinney.
- Introduced, referred to Judiciary.
- Subcommittee Meeting: 01/13/2022 1:30PM House Lounge.
On January 11, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Westrich, Gustafson and Meyer, B.
- Introduced, referred to Judiciary.
+ − Sponsor
COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY
Type:
Primary Sponsor