+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar.
On March 10, 2020 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending amendment and passage.
On February 12, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
On February 10, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/11/2020 11:35AM House Lounge.
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Maxwell, Kurtz and Sieck.
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to Ways and Means.
On January 30, 2020 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending passage.
On January 29, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
On January 22, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Landon, Sieck and Smith, R..
On January 15, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to Transportation.
+ − Sponsor
COMMITTEE ON TRANSPORTATION
Type:
Primary Sponsor