+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
On February 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Rozenboom, Behn, and Kinney.
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read first time, referred to Natural Resources and Environment.
- Message from House.
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- Withdrawn.
- Immediate message.
- Passed House, ayes 97, nays none.
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
On February 2, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Klein, Olson and Wheeler.
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to Public Safety.
On January 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Schultz, Bisignano, and Shipley.
On January 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Judiciary.
+ − Sponsor
COMMITTEE ON PUBLIC SAFETY
Type:
Primary Sponsor