+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- Amendment H-8031 filed.
On February 24, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending passage.
- Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
On February 17, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: Upon Adjournment House Lounge.
On February 10, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
On February 6, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Wheeler, Baxter and Judge.
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/06/2020 9:30AM House Lounge.
- Subcommittee: Sorensen, Donahue and Moore, T..
On January 31, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to State Government.
On January 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Schultz, Chapman, and T. Taylor.
On January 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to State Government.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor