+ − Transition
HSB218 is now HF724
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (29)
On March 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar under unfinished business.
On March 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee report, recommending passage.
On March 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 03/09/2022 2:30PM Room G15.
On January 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Schultz, Boulton, and Guth.
On June 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Labor and Business Relations.
- Referred to Labor and Business Relations.
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Amendment S-3152 filed.
On April 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar under unfinished business.
- Placed on calendar under unfinished business.
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read first time, attached to similar SF 362.
- Message from House.
- Attached to similar HF 724.
On March 25, 2021 in the House:
- Amendment H-1285 adopted.
- Passed House, yeas 95, nays none.
- Immediate message.
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- Amendment H-1285 filed.
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
- Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 724.
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending passage.
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/23/2021 7:45AM RM 103, Sup. Ct. Chamber.
On February 16, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Lohse, Kressig and Nordman.
- Introduced, referred to Commerce.
On February 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill.
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 362.
On January 19, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
On January 14, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 01/19/2021 11:00AM 217 Conference Room.
On January 12, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Green, Boulton, and Guth.
- Introduced, referred to Labor and Business Relations.