+ − Transition
HF2171 is now SF2258
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (27)
On May 23, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor.
On April 21, 2022 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
On April 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn.
- HF 2171 substituted.
- Immediate message.
- Passed Senate, yeas 48, nays 0.
- Substituted for SF 2258.
On March 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar under unfinished business.
- Placed on calendar under unfinished business.
On February 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Attached to companion HF 2171.
- Read first time, attached to companion SF 2258.
- Message from House.
On February 22, 2022 in the House:
- Immediate message.
- Passed House, yeas 95, nays 0.
On February 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee report, recommending passage.
On February 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
On February 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/15/2022 12:00PM Room G15.
- Subcommittee: Costello, Green, and Ragan.
On February 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Human Resources.
On January 31, 2022 in the House:
- Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2171.
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On January 27, 2022 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending passage.
On January 25, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0
On January 24, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 01/25/2022 12:30PM House Lounge.
On January 19, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Moore, T., Dolecheck and Forbes.
- Introduced, referred to Human Resources.
+ − Sponsor
COMMITTEE ON HUMAN RESOURCES
Type:
Primary Sponsor