+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (21)
On June 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Committee report, recommending passage.
On March 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Costello, Ragan, and Segebart.
On March 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read first time, referred to Human Resources.
- Message from House.
On March 9, 2020 in the House:
- Immediate message.
- Passed House, yeas 98, nays 1.
- Amendment H-8102 withdrawn.
- Withdrawn.
- Withdrawn.
On March 6, 2020 in the House:
- Amendment H-8102 filed.
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on Appropriations calendar.
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending passage.
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/26/2020 3:00PM House Lounge.
On February 24, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Dolecheck, Kerr and Winckler.
On February 21, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to Appropriations.
On February 19, 2020 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending passage.
On February 13, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
On February 12, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/13/2020 9:30AM House Lounge.
On January 29, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Dolecheck, Bergan and Ehlert.
- Introduced, referred to Human Resources.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor