+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (22)
On April 23, 2018 in the House:
- Amendment H-8392 filed.
On April 18, 2018 in the House:
- Senate amendment H-8386 filed.
- Message from Senate.
On April 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
- Passed Senate, ayes 46, nays 0.
- Amendment S-5176 out of order.
- Amendment S-5250 filed, adopted.
- Amendments S-5244 and S-5248 withdrawn.
On April 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Amendments S-5244 and S-5248 filed.
On March 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar under unfinished business.
On March 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Amendment S-5176 filed.
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee report, recommending passage.
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Rozenboom, Kapucian, and Kinney.
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Natural Resources and Environment.
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read first time, passed on file.
- Message from House.
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- Immediate message.
- Passed House, ayes 93 nays 1.
- Withdrawn.
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Baxter, Cownie and Nielsen.
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to Natural Resources.