+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
- Sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President.
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
- Passed Senate, ayes 35, nays 14.
- Substituted for SF 2232.
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read first time and attached to companion SF 2232.
- Message from House.
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Immediate message.
- Passed House, ayes 98, nays none.
- Withdrawn.
On February 9, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Landon, Best and Heddens.
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to Transportation.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor