+ − Transition
HF2137 is now HF2549
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (35)
On June 24, 2022 in the House:
- Explanation of vote.
On June 13, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On June 2, 2022 in the House:
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor.
On May 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Message from House.
On May 23, 2022 in the House:
- Immediate message.
- Passed House, yeas 83, nays 0.
- House concurred in Senate amendment H-8366, yeas 52, nays 31.
On April 26, 2022 in the House:
- Senate amendment H-8366 filed.
- Message from Senate.
On April 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, yeas 44, nays 0.
- Amendment S-5140 filed, adopted.
- Substituted for SF 2195.
- Immediate message.
On March 22, 2022 in the House:
- Explanation of vote.
On March 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar under unfinished business.
On March 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read first time, attached to similar SF 2195.
- Message from House.
On March 15, 2022 in the House:
- Withdrawn.
- Immediate message.
- Amendment H-8181 adopted.
- Passed House, yeas 94, nays 2.
On March 14, 2022 in the House:
- Amendment H-8181 filed.
On March 2, 2022 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on Appropriations calendar.
- Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2549.
On March 1, 2022 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending amendment and passage.
On February 24, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 5-0
On February 18, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/24/2022 8:30AM House Lounge 1.
On February 1, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Fry, Brown-Powers, Forbes, Kerr and Meyer, A.
On January 28, 2022 in the House:
- Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2137.
- Introduced, referred to Appropriations.
On January 25, 2022 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending amendment and passage.
On January 19, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. Vote Total: 3-0
On January 18, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 01/19/2022 12:00PM RM 19.
On January 13, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Dolecheck, Forbes and Moore, T.
- Introduced, referred to Human Resources.
+ − Sponsor
COMMITTEE ON HUMAN RESOURCES
Type:
Primary Sponsor