+ − Transition
HSB213 is now SF413
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (45)
On June 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Fiscal note.
On March 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
- Signed by Governor.
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Message from House.
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- Explanation of vote.
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Immediate message.
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Secretary's report on correction in engrossment.
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Substituted for HF 590.
- Amendment H-1113 lost.
- Fiscal note.
- Passed House, yeas 57, nays 37.
- Amendment H-1116 to amendment H-1107 filed.
- Amendment H-1116 to amendment H-1107 lost.
- Amendment H-1117 to amendment H-1107 filed, adopted.
- Amendment H-1107 adopted, as amended.
- Amendment H-1109 lost.
- Amendment H-1111 withdrawn.
- SF 413 substituted.
- Withdrawn.
On February 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Amendment S-3039 filed, lost.
- Amendment S-3034 filed, adopted.
- Amendment S-3041 filed, lost.
- Amendment S-3042 filed, lost.
- Amendment S-3040 filed, lost.
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- Read first time, passed on file.
On February 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, yeas 30, nays 18.
- Immediate message.
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
- Amendment H-1113 filed.
- Fiscal note.
- Amendments H-1107, H-1109 and H-1111 filed.
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Fiscal note.
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending passage.
- Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 590.
- Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 413.
On February 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
- Committee report, approving bill.
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
On February 16, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/17/2021 2:30PM RM 111.
- Subcommittee: Smith, R., Jochum, and Schultz.
- Introduced, referred to State Government.
- Subcommittee Meeting: Upon adjournment of House Chamber Law Library.
- Subcommittee: Kaufmann, Boden, Mascher, Nordman and Wolfe.
- Introduced, referred to State Government.