+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Explanation of vote.
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Sinclair, Behn, and Quirmbach.
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- Explanation of vote.
On February 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read first time, referred to Education.
- Message from House.
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- Immediate message.
- Passed House, yeas 96, nays none.
- Withdrawn.
On February 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Sinclair, Behn, and Quirmbach.
On February 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Education.
On February 7, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending amendment and passage.
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
On January 30, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/04/2020 9:30AM House Lounge.
On January 29, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Gassman, Dolecheck and Winckler.
On January 27, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to Education.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor