+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (18)
On June 25, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On June 24, 2020 in the House:
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor.
On June 12, 2020 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
On June 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
- Passed Senate, yeas 48, nays 0.
On June 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Committee report, recommending passage.
On March 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Segebart, Carlin, and Jochum.
On March 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read first time, referred to Human Resources.
- Message from House.
On March 9, 2020 in the House:
- Withdrawn.
- Immediate message.
- Passed House, yeas 99, nays none.
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On February 20, 2020 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending amendment and passage.
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
On February 17, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/18/2020 11:30AM RM 308.
- Subcommittee: Bacon, Brown-Powers and Lundgren.
On January 23, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to Human Resources.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor