+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On February 18, 2022 in the House:
- Fiscal note.
On February 2, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0
On February 1, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/02/2022 8:00AM RM 304.
On January 26, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Hite, Staed and Wheeler.
On January 25, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means.
On January 24, 2022 in the House:
- Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2082.
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On January 20, 2022 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending amendment and passage.
On January 19, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-0
On January 13, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 01/18/2022 4:00PM RM 102, Sup. Ct. Consult.
On January 11, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Hite, Gjerde and Ingels.
- Introduced, referred to Education.
+ − Sponsor
COMMITTEE ON EDUCATION
Type:
Primary Sponsor