+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (19)
On April 4, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 3, 2018 in the House:
- Sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President.
On March 26, 2018 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
On March 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
- Passed Senate, ayes 47, nays 0.
On March 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar under unfinished business.
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee report, recommending passage.
On February 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Breitbach, Bowman, and Zumbach.
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- Explanation of vote.
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read first time, referred to Transportation.
- Message from House.
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Immediate message.
- Passed House, ayes 98, nays none.
- Withdrawn.
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On January 30, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
On January 25, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Landon, Huseman and R. Smith.
On January 23, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to Transportation.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor