+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (31)
On June 17, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On June 16, 2020 in the House:
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor.
On June 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn.
- HF 2269 substituted.
- Withdrawn.
- HF 2269 substituted.
On June 4, 2020 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
On June 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
- Passed Senate, yeas 49, nays 0.
- Substituted for SF 2345.
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Explanation of vote.
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- Explanation of vote.
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- Withdrawn.
- Passed House, yeas 96, nays none.
- Immediate message.
On February 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Message from House.
- Read first time, attached to companion SF 2345.
- Attached to companion HF 2269.
On February 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill.
- Introduced, placed on calendar, under Rule 28.
- Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2345.
On February 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
On February 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/18/2020 1:30PM Senate Lobbyist Lounge.
- Subcommittee: Costello, Carlin, and Ragan.
On February 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Human Resources.
On February 6, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending passage.
On January 29, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
On January 27, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 01/29/2020 11:30AM House Lounge.
On January 21, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Osmundson, Derry and Salmon.
- Introduced, referred to Human Resources.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor