+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (25)
On May 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Item vetoed, signed by Governor
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker.
- Sent to Governor.
On April 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Message from House.
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- Amendment H-1394 lost.
- Read first time, passed on file.
- Substituted for HF 641.
- Amendment H-1393 filed, lost.
- Amendment H-1394 filed.
- Amendment H-1392 filed, withdrawn.
- Passed House, ayes 58, nays 40.
- Immediate message.
- Asked and received unanimous consent for immediate consideration.
- Amendment H-1381 filed, adopted.
- SF 510 substituted.
- Withdrawn.
On April 17, 2017 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
On April 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
- Passed Senate, ayes 29, nays 21.
- Amendment S-3323 filed, lost.
- Amendment S-3326 filed, adopted.
On April 14, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on Appropriations calendar.
- Committee report, recommending passage.
On April 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill.
- Introduced, placed on Appropriations calendar.