+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (35)
On April 26, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 25, 2018 in the House:
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor.
On April 12, 2018 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
On April 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
- Passed Senate, ayes 46, nays 0.
- Senate concurred with S-5235.
On April 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Message from House, with amendment S-5235.
On April 10, 2018 in the House:
- House concurred in Senate amendment H-8363, as amended.
- Amendment H-8375, to Senate amendment H-8363 filed, adopted.
- Explanation of vote.
- Passed House, ayes 96, nays 2.
- Immediate message.
On April 4, 2018 in the House:
- Senate amendment H-8363 filed.
- Message from Senate.
On April 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
- Passed Senate, ayes 49, nays 0.
- Amendment S-5217 filed, adopted.
On March 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar under unfinished business.
On March 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee report, recommending passage.
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- Explanation of vote.
On March 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Sinclair, Bowman, and Chelgren.
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read first time, referred to Education.
- Message from House.
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Withdrawn.
- Amendment H-8205 to H-8186 filed, adopted.
- Amendment H-8186 adopted, as amended.
- Passed House, ayes 96 nays 1.
- Immediate message.
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Amendment H-8186 filed.
On February 23, 2018 in the House:
- Fiscal note.
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
On January 25, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee reassigned: Hager, Brown-Powers and Wheeler.
On January 23, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Jones, Brown-Powers and Wheeler.
On January 10, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to Education.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor