+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- Amendment H-8047 filed.
On February 11, 2020 in the House:
- Fiscal note.
On February 7, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar.
On February 6, 2020 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending passage.
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
On January 27, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 01/30/2020 11:00AM House Lounge.
On January 24, 2020 in the House:
- Fiscal note.
On January 21, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Kaufmann, Jacoby and Jones.
On January 15, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to Ways and Means.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor