+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On December 31, 2013 in the House:
- * * * * * END OF 2013 ACTIONS * * * * *
On April 12, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Human Resources. H.J. 836.
On April 5, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 759.
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- Fiscal note. HCS.
- Amendment H-1136 filed. H.J. 590.
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 546.
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Voted - Human Resources.
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Human Resources: Miller, L. Chair,Wessel-Kroeschell, and Costello.
- Date Recorded
+ − Sponsors (3)
Subcommittee assigned
Type:
Primary Sponsor