+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (37)
On May 2, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 29, 2019 in the House:
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor.
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, yeas 44, nays 5.
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar under unfinished business.
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report, recommending passage.
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Sinclair, Giddens, and Kraayenbrink.
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Amendment H-1032 adopted, as amended.
- Withdrawn.
- Amendment H-1042 to H-1032 adopted.
- Passed House, yeas 91, nays 5.
- Immediate message.
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Message from House.
- Read first time, referred to Education.
On March 18, 2019 in the House:
- Amendment H-1042 filed.
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Amendment H-1032 filed.
On March 4, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending amendment and passage.
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/12/2019 11:30AM House Lounge.
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Wheeler, James and Mommsen.
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to Education.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor