+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (26)
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Message from House, with amendment S-3146.
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- Passed House, ayes 99, nays none.
- House concurred in Senate amendment H-1213, as amended.
- Amendment H-1256 to Senate amendment H-1213 filed, adopted.
- Immediate message.
On April 9, 2015 in the House:
- Senate amendment H-1213 filed.
- Message from Senate.
On April 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
- Passed Senate, ayes 48, nays none.
- Amendment S-3103 adopted.
On April 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Amendment S-3103 filed.
- Committee report, recommending amendment and passage.
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- Amendment H-1114 adopted.
- Amendment H-1145 adopted.
- Amendment H-1113 withdrawn.
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read first time, referred to Human Resources.
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- Passed House, ayes 99, nays none.
- Immediate message.
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Message from House.
- Subcommittee, Mathis, Johnson, and Ragan.
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Amendment H-1145 filed.
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Amendments H-1113 and H-1114 filed.
On March 6, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On March 2, 2015 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 3:30PM House Lounge
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- Human Resources: Taylor, R. Chair, Winckler, Wills
- Recorded