+ − Transition
HSB180 is now HF498
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On March 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Commerce.
On April 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee report, recommending passage.
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
On March 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 03/24/2021 12:30PM RM 24A.
On March 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Klimesh, Koelker, and Mathis.
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Explanation of vote.
On March 8, 2021 in the House:
- Amendment H-1105 adopted.
- Passed House, yeas 96, nays none.
- Immediate message.
On March 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Message from House.
- Read first time, referred to Commerce.
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- Amendment H-1105 filed.
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending passage.
On February 9, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/10/2021 12:00PM House Lounge.
On February 3, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Best, McConkey and Mitchell.
- Introduced, referred to Commerce.